THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:13:00 PM
Oliver, Steven William
CPSO#:
76805
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
3570 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON K2J 5L4
Phone: (613) 823-4991
Fax: (613) 823-6221
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN WILLIAM OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 04 Aug 2005
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2006 |