THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:08:42 PM
Chan, Philip Chun-Wai
CPSO#:
76787
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Chan Medicine Proefssional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2010 |