THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:12:15 PM
Malik, Rajnish Neesh
CPSO#:
76758
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: N. Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 19 2010
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dauphin Regional Health Centre, Department of Radiology, 625 3rd Street Southwest, Dauphin, MB, R7N 1R7
Date Received: 07 Jun 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:17 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2016 |