THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:10:42 PM
Zbuk, Kevin Michael
CPSO#:
76742
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Oncology
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 64604
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:31 Dec 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN MICHAEL ZBUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZBUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2001 |