THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:28:04 AM
Bleakney, Robert Reginald
CPSO#:
76738
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue 5th Floor
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6199
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:09 May 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT REGINALD BLEAKNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLEAKNEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 03 Apr 2003
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Apr 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2008 |