THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:17:16 PM
Racicot, Jean-Mathieu
CPSO#:
76721
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
622 4e rue Ouest
Amos J9T 2S2
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jean-Mathieu Racicot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:16 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEAN-MATHIEU RACICOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACICOT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 May 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2023 |