THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:53:57 AM
Cherney, Olga Hanna
CPSO#:
76715
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
29 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: O.H.Cherney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 13 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 07 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2017 |