THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:25:06 AM
Bahl, Mala
CPSO#:
76712
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Thomas Jefferson University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Center Site
150 Sherway Drive
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 416-521-4110
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bahl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 15 2013
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:10 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MALA BAHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2003 |