THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 16:31:45 PM
Elmontaser, Ghazi Ibrahim A
CPSO#:
76711
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
80 Grand Avenue W
Chatham ON N7M 5L9
Phone: 5064768034
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ghazi Elmontaser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 15 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:08 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GHAZI IBRAHIM A ELMONTASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMONTASER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2016 |