THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:36:44 AM
Malig, Lita Liangco
CPSO#:
76699
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Dec 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Andres, Lita Liangco Malig (used until: 15 Aug 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: Far Eastern University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 416
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 569-8377
Fax: (905) 569-8378
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LITA LIANGCO MALIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2003 |