THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:45:18 PM
Gunasekera, Shiny Dinuka
CPSO#:
76682
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mood disorders Program
100 West 5th Street
PO Box 585
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33179
Fax: (905) 381-5629
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHINY DINUKA GUNASEKERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNASEKERA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 09 Jul 2001 to 19 Oct 2001
EL - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |