THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 21:30:06 PM
Ali, Yaser M A Hussain Gh
CPSO#:
76677
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Y. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:20 Oct 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:04 Oct 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2017 |