THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:34:51 AM
Gupta, Abha Anshu
CPSO#:
76628
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Nov 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Division of Medical Oncology
Suite 7-714
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-2252
Fax: 416-946-6546
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:17 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABHA ANSHU GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2004 |