THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:16:48 AM
Kanani, Ronik
CPSO#:
76614
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: University of Calgary, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Room 369
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566548
Fax: 4167566274
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RONIK KANANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |