THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:01:22 PM
Fakhry, Yousef Mohammad Saeed
CPSO#:
76574
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yousef Fakhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:14 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Mar 2015 |