THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:52:04 PM
Latham, Warren Cameron Wigmore
CPSO#:
76568
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Dec 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
385 Silverstar Blvd
Scarborough ON M1V 0E3
Phone: (416) 412-3535
Fax: (416) 412-3536
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Warren Latham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WARREN CAMERON WIGMORE LATHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2019 |