THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:12:59 AM
Joyce, Susan Mary
CPSO#:
76556
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3H 1T1
Fax: (416) 785-8324
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY JOYCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYCE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2002 to 28 Jun 2002
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2002 |