THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 22:51:26 PM
Alidina, Zahra
CPSO#:
76545
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100-355 Adelaide St W
Toronto ON M5V 1S2
Phone: 6474977453
Fax: 18556324962
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZAHRA ALIDINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIDINA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2003 |