THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:43:21 PM
Cupsa, Andreea
CPSO#:
76539
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian, Romanian
Education: University of Ottawa, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit A
1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa ON K2K 0G1
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (613) 254-9778
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Sep 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREEA CUPSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUPSA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 11 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2002 to 26 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 23 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2004 |