THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:38:19 PM
Puchalski Ritchie, Lisa Marie
CPSO#:
76536
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
RFE - G5-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LISA MARIE PUCHALSKI RITCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUCHALSKI RITCHIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2007 |