THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:56:29 AM
Sheth, Nikita Tej
CPSO#:
76525
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Bombay, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2015 Kingsridge Drive
unit 6
Oakville ON L6M 4Y7
Phone: 905 465 3878
Fax: 905 827 4737
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIKITA TEJ SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2003 |