THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:12:30 AM
Lodha, Vinay
CPSO#:
76513
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6905
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VINAY LODHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LODHA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 11 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2002 to 11 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 19 Dec 2006
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |