THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:58:56 AM
Kelton, Yasmine Silvia
CPSO#:
76511
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Rizwan, Yasmine Silvia (used until: 25 Jan 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese
Education: University of Ottawa, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
141 King Rd
Unit 8
Richmond Hill ON L4E 3L7
Phone: 9053138000
Fax: 9053138001
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Timothy J. Kelton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASMINE SILVIA KELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2003 |