THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:38:55 PM
Grewal, Seena Sukhpreet Kaur
CPSO#:
76496
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4500 Oak St
BC Children's Hospital
Psychiatry
3rd floor
Vancouver BC V6H 3N1
Phone: 6048752010
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Seena Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEENA SUKHPREET KAUR GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Sep 2008
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |