THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:27:42 PM
Assaad, Ihab Guirguis Rizk
CPSO#:
76488
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IHAB GUIRGUIS RIZK ASSAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 09 Oct 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Oct 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Apr 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jul 2008 |