THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:07:55 PM
Carroll, Julia Marie
CPSO#:
76471
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Compass Dermatology
Units 8 and 9
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON M4S 2N5
Phone: (647) 351-9277
Fax: (647) 351-9077
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:18 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIA MARIE CARROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARROLL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2007 |