THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:23:43 AM
Malik, Nariman
CPSO#:
76449
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
Department of Anesthesia
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2561
Fax: (416) 495-2879
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Aug 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NARIMAN MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2007 |