THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:28:31 PM
Kongkham, Paul Narin
CPSO#:
76442
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
West Wing 4th Floor Room 4 450
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5428
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL NARIN KONGKHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONGKHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |