THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:30:10 PM
Ewing, Kevin Lindsay
CPSO#:
76439
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital,
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: (519) 973-0803
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN LINDSAY EWING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EWING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2006 |