THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 14:45:12 PM
Crispino, Natascha Heidemarie
CPSO#:
76416
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family Medicine
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway East Wing
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATASCHA HEIDEMARIE CRISPINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRISPINO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2003 |