THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:00:51 PM
Bui, Luke Long Quoc
CPSO#:
76406
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10023 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1T7
Phone: (905) 918-0243
Fax: (905) 918-0391
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Luke L. Bui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUKE LONG QUOC BUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2006 |