THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:02:22 AM
Weinreb, Ilan
CPSO#:
76392
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room 11E211
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5146
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ILAN WEINREB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINREB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2006 |