THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:15:21 AM
Render-Teixeira, Caroline Louise
CPSO#:
76360
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2625 E Divisadero St
CCFMG
Fresno CA 93721-143
USA
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Fernando Teixeira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLINE LOUISE RENDER-TEIXEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENDER-TEIXEIRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2004 |