THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:40:23 AM
Simkin, Sarah Rachel
CPSO#:
76355
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
Phone: 613-256-2500
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH RACHEL SIMKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMKIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2004 |