THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:44:52 AM
Khan, Omar Daniel Manan
CPSO#:
76350
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: McMaster University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
ODK Physical Medicine
Hotel Dieu Shaver Rehab Centre
Medical Clinic South
547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 685-1381 Ext. 85201
Fax: (905) 685-5390
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Omar D. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 13 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMAR DANIEL MANAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2006 |