THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 18:40:10 PM
Thiruganasambandamoorthy, Venkatesh
CPSO#:
76347
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
Clinical Epidemiology Program F6
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Fax: (613) 761-5351
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:17 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VENKATESH THIRUGANASAMBANDAMOORTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRUGANASAMBANDAMOORTHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2001 to 27 Aug 2001
EL - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2002 |