THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:19:28 PM
Shahi, Sundeep
CPSO#:
76337
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Ottawa, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:23 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNDEEP SHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 17 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 18 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2011 |