THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:41:10 PM
Ellen, Ruth Lesley Bramme
CPSO#:
76310
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2515
Fax: (613) 721-2582
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUTH LESLEY BRAMME ELLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Geriatric Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Geriatric Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |