THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:00:17 PM
Eaton, Christopher John
CPSO#:
76276
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health
Services
302 - 1 Nicholas St
Ottawa ON K1N 7B7
Phone: (613) 564-3950 Ext. 296
Fax: 6135646627
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. J. Eaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN EATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EATON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2015 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 07 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 06 Oct 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Oct 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2019 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 Aug 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2023 |