THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:44:32 AM
Billie, Christine
CPSO#:
76275
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bobaljik, Christine Anne (used until: 26 Sep 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE BILLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILLIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 22 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2002 to 17 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2004 |