THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:30:50 PM
Beresford, Meaghen Joanne
CPSO#:
76273
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hyland, Meaghen Joanne (used until: 06 Nov 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mt Sinai Hosp., 600 University Ave
rm 1276, 12th Floor
Marvelle Koffler Breast Cen, TO, ON
M5G1XS
Toronto ON M5S 1B5
Phone: 647-524-0514
Fax: 416-946-6564
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEAGHEN JOANNE BERESFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERESFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Feb 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2006 |