THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:37:44 PM
Litner, Michelle Sima
CPSO#:
76272
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Fischbach, Michelle Sima (used until: 22 Jul 2001 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic
8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON L4J 0B8
Phone: (905) 709-9709
Fax: (905) 709-9701
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Litner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE SIMA LITNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITNER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2003 |