THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:21:01 PM
Shuldiner, Sarit Leba
CPSO#:
76266
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Somogyi, Sarit Leba (used until: 06 Jul 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University City Mall
45 Four Winds Drive
Toronto ON M3J 1K7
Phone: (416) 665-7708
Fax: (416) 665-4560
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARIT LEBA SHULDINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULDINER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2002 |