THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 10:57:34 AM
Singh, Ravinder
CPSO#:
76261
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Ottawa, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
107 Shirriff Avenue
North Bay ON P1B 8K7
Phone: (705) 472-2646
Fax: (705) 476-6543
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAVINDER SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2006 |