THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 5:37:56 AM
Saltel, Marc Eric Jonathan
CPSO#:
76260
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Saltel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 12 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus, 1053 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON, K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 13 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:09 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2016 |