THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:31:19 AM
Halliday, Sarah Marie Francoise
CPSO#:
76256
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6526
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Jul 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH MARIE FRANCOISE HALLIDAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALLIDAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 23 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 10 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 11 Jul 2005 to 10 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 11 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2008 |