THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:47:31 PM
Schaefer, Rachel Irene
CPSO#:
76228
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Attn: Dr. Aisha Rashid
314-460 Springbank Drive
London, ON
N6J 0A8
Phone: 519-672-8364
Date Received: 10 Nov 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL IRENE SCHAEFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAEFER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: September 11, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Rachel Schaefer was charged with the following offence:
1. Assault, on or about January 20, 2023, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: September 11, 2023
Place of Charge: London, Ontario
London Police Service