THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:47:27 AM
DeSa, Michelle Gwen
CPSO#:
76226
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Nov 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Nov 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
210-1885 Glenanna Rd
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
Phone: 905-492-0333
Fax: 905-420-8523
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE GWEN DESA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Jan 2005 to 04 Feb 2005
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2005 |