THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:18:19 AM
Saberi, Farzad
CPSO#:
76225
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Persian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Saberi & Rahnema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2009 |