THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:48:54 PM
Kleiner, Galit
CPSO#:
76210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Kleiner-Fisman, Galit (used until: 11 Jan 2017 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3560 Bathurst St
Baycrest Health Sciences/Movement D
Division of Neurology
Kimel Bldg
North York ON M6A 2E1
Phone: 416-785-2517
Fax: 647-788-4886
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GALIT KLEINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEINER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2006 |